EP1925694 - Processes for producing oxidation resistant coating articles and their coated articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/22] | Oxidation resistant coatings, processes for coating articles, and their coated articles | ||
[2018/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tang, Xia 119 Montclair Drive West Hartford, ct 06107 / US | 02 /
Bhatia, Tania 53 West Wynd Terrace Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 03 /
Jarmon, David C. 44 Blue Ridge Road Kensington, CT 06037 / US | 04 /
Schmidt, Wayde R. 7 Amberg Drive Pomfret Center, CT 06259 / US | 05 /
Eaton, Harry E. 391 Perrin Road Woodstock, CT 06281 / US | 06 /
Smeggil, John G. 12 Tollgate Lane Simsbury, CT 06070 / US | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/22] | 01 /
Tang, Xia 119 Montclair Drive West Hartford, ct 06107 / US | ||
02 /
Bhatia, Tania 53 West Wynd Terrace Middletown, CT 06457 / US | |||
03 /
Jarmon, David C. 44 Blue Ridge Road Kensington, CT 06037 / US | |||
04 /
Schmitdt, Wayde R. 7 Amberg Drive Pomfret Center, CT 06259 / US | |||
05 /
Eaton, Harry E. 391 Perrin Road Woodstock, CT 06281 / US | |||
06 /
Smeggil, John G. 12 Tollgate Lane Simsbury, CT 06070 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/22] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253635.2 | 12.09.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | US20060603622 | 21.11.2006 Original published format: US 603622 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1925694 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1925694 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925694 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C26/00, C23C24/08, C04B41/52, C04B41/89, C04B41/00, C23C24/10, C23C30/00 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C23C24/10 (EP);
C23C26/00 (EP,US);
C23C30/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/565 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/584 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/806 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4539, C04B41/455, C04B41/5027, C04B41/5035 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2008/22] | C23C26/00, C23C24/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2011/45] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur oxidationsbeständige Beschichtung von Artikeln und beschichtete Artikel | [2018/50] | English: | Processes for producing oxidation resistant coating articles and their coated articles | [2018/50] | French: | Procédés pour le revêtement d'articles résistant à l'oxyxdation et leurs articles revêtus | [2018/50] |
Former [2008/22] | Oxidationsbeständige Beschichtungen, Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Artikeln und beschichtete Artikel | ||
Former [2008/22] | Oxidation resistant coatings, processes for coating articles, and their coated articles | ||
Former [2008/22] | Revêtements résistant à l'oxydation, procédés pour le revêtement d'articles et leurs articles revêtus | Examination procedure | 01.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 03.09.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4039997 (HUANG CORNELIUS Y D, et al) [X] 1-6,8,12,15,16,20,21 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 60 *; | [XI]EP0672632 (AEROSPATIALE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8,12,15,16,20,21,26-30 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 1 - line 22 * [I] 9,10; | [I]US5569427 (SEMENOVA ELENA V [RU], et al) [I] 1-10,15,16,20,21,26 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 36 *; | [XAI]WO03099739 (SAINT GOBAIN CERAMICS [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10,13,15,16,20,21,24-26,28 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 22 * * claims 1-27,33,34 * [A] 4,5,12,17-19,22,23,29,30 [I] 6,7,9,11; | [E]US7767305 (STEWART DAVID A [US], et al) [E] 1-4,6,8,10,12,14-30 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, line 4 - line 57 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 41 ** examples 1-8; claims 1-6 * | by applicant | US5677060 | US7060360 |