EP1906333 - Methods and arrangements to launch trusted, co-existing environments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2014/43] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard, SC4-202 Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmer, Vincent 1937 South 369th Street Federal Way, WA 98003 / US | 02 /
Cool, Lyle 5300 SW Elm Avenue Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2008/14] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253768.1 | 24.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | US20060527180 | 26.09.2006 Original published format: US 527180 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906333 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1906333 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906333 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/53, G06F21/57, G06F9/50 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
G06F21/53 (EP,US);
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
G06F21/575 (US);
G06F9/24 (KR);
G06F9/5077 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnungen zur Erstellung zuverlässiger koexistierender Umgebungen | [2008/14] | English: | Methods and arrangements to launch trusted, co-existing environments | [2008/14] | French: | Procédés et agencements pour lancer des environnements coexistants de confiance | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 10.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2014 | 08.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2007 | AT | 22.10.2014 | BE | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | DK | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | ES | 22.10.2014 | FI | 22.10.2014 | IT | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | NL | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | SE | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.09.2007 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
DK | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
SE | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
FI | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
NL | 22.10.2014 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005138370 (GOUD GUNDRALA D [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15; | [I]US2005210467 (ZIMMER VINCENT J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I] - BERGER S ET AL, "IBM Research Report RC23879, vTPM: Virtualizing the Trusted Platform Module", IBM RESEARCH REPORT, SAN JOSE, CA, US, (20060214), no. RC23879, pages 1 - 18, XP002451988 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2005138370 | US2005210467 | - BERGER S ET AL., "IBM Research Report RC23879. vTPM: Virtualizing the Trusted Platform Module", IBM RESEARCH REPORT, SAN JOSE, CA, US, (20060214), pages 1 - 18 |