EP1909201 - Information processing apparatus and method, program and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Mari c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Yoshiyuki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Takaomi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Merryweather, Colin Henry, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Tyson, Robin Edward J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07253858.0 | 28.09.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | JP20060270962 | 02.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006270962 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909201 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1909201 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G06F16/61 (EP,US);
G06F17/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/41] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Informationsverarbeitung, Programm und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2008/15] | English: | Information processing apparatus and method, program and recording medium | [2008/15] | French: | Appareil et procédé de traitement d'informations, programme et support d'enregistrement | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 29.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHO S-B, "Emotional Image and Musical Information Retrieval With Interactive Genetic Algorithm", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20040401), vol. 92, no. 4, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2004.825900, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 702 - 711, XP011109945 [X] 1-14 * page 703, column l, paragraph l - page 704, column l, paragraph 4 * * page 707, column l, paragraph 2 - page 710, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2004.825900 |