Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1916220 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1916220



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 466
31.05.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
30.06.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.06.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.06.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
20.06.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
20.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.02.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 30
19.02.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 30
15.11.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.11.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
23.05.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
23.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
23.05.2013 Description Search / examination 5
23.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.05.2013 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 16
23.05.2013 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
23.05.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
04.02.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
30.01.2013 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
25.01.2013 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 11
16.11.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
20.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
20.05.2011 Description Search / examination 6
20.05.2011 Description Search / examination 5
20.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
10.02.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.03.2009 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
09.12.2008 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
24.10.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
24.10.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
24.10.2008 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.10.2008 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.10.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
07.05.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.04.2008 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.02.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.02.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 10
22.02.2008 European search report Search / examination 3
08.02.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
29.01.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 153
21.12.2007 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
17.12.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
06.12.2007 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.12.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
21.11.2007 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
15.10.2007 Description Search / examination 16
15.10.2007 Drawings Search / examination 8
15.10.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6