EP2031942 - Load control module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Investment Co., Ltd. 3F.-8, No. 57, Sec. 1 Dunhua S. Rd. Songshan, Taipei 105 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states GE Investment Co., Ltd. 3F.-8, No. 57, Sec. 1 Dunhua S. Rd. Songshan, Taipai 105 / TW | ||
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Topco Technologies Corp. 14F., No. 102, Sec. 4, Civic Blvd. Da-an District, Taipei City 106 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsai, Wen-Kuei No. 230, Sec. 1, Jhong-Hua Rd. 12 Neighborhood, Jhong-Mei Village Sin-Jhuang City Taipei County / TW | 02 /
Wang, Chun-Chien No. 5, Alley 2, Lane 753 Kangning St. Sijhih City Taipei County 221 / TW | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Schönfelstraße 26 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Siegesstr. 13 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/21] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/29] | Hodsdon, Stephen James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2010/18] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254097.4 | 16.10.2007 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | CN200710148134 | 28.08.2007 Original published format: CN200710148134 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2031942 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2031942 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H05B39/04, H05B41/39, H05B41/40, H05B33/08 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
H05B39/04 (EP,US);
H05B41/39 (EP,US);
H05B41/40 (EP,US);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
H05B47/185 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | Ladungskontrollmodul | [2009/10] | English: | Load control module | [2009/10] | French: | Module de contrôle de charge | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7235933 (SO YU-SHENG [TW]) [A] 1 * detection and logic circuits; column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 18; figure 1 * * light level's adjustment sequence; column 5, line 19 - line 58 *; | [A]DE10353460 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0015] *; | [A]GB2236025 (MILLS DESMOND BRYAN LEON, et al) [A] 1 * dimmer's operation; page 6 - page 7 * |