EP1914466 - Display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makino, Katsuhiko, c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7-chome, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2012/04] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
Makino, Katsuhiko, c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7-chome, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254109.7 | 17.10.2007 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | JP20060284178 | 18.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006284178 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1914466 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1914466 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914466 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/02 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
F16M11/10 (EP,US);
G06F1/1601 (EP,US);
F16M2200/08 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1612 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/47] |
Former [2011/11] | DE, FR, GB, PL | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [2008/17] | English: | Display | [2008/17] | French: | Ecran | [2012/03] |
Former [2008/17] | Écran | Examination procedure | 29.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 08.01.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004155166 (KIM SUNG-GI [KR]) [X] 1-6,8-10 * figures 1-4 * [I] 7,11-16; | [XI]EP1617314 (ORION ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,8-10 * figures 1-6 *[I] 4,5,7,11-16; | [XDI]JP2006091713 (TOSHIBA CORP) [XD] 1-6,8-10 * the whole document * [I] 7,11-16 | by applicant | JP2004118191 | JP3107250U | JP2005221823 | JP3116087U | JP2006091713 |