EP1923975 - Cord reel including one or more electrical devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belkin International, Inc. 12045 East Waterfront Drive Playa Vista, CA 90094 / US | [2010/38] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Belkin International, Inc. 501 West Walnut Street Compton, CA 90220 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suckle, Mitchell c/o Belkin International, Inc. 501 West Walnut Street Compton CA 90220 / US | 02 /
Albright, John c/o Belkin International, Inc. 501 West Walnut Street Compton CA 90220 / US | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254136.0 | 18.10.2007 | [2008/21] | Priority number, date | US20060852889P | 18.10.2006 Original published format: US 852889 P | US20060852888P | 18.10.2006 Original published format: US 852888 P | US20060853011P | 18.10.2006 Original published format: US 853011 P | US20060852890P | 18.10.2006 Original published format: US 852890 P | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923975 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02G11/02 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
B65H75/403 (EP,US);
B65H75/4402 (EP,US);
B65H75/4465 (EP,US);
B65H75/4468 (EP,US);
H02G11/02 (EP,US);
B65H2701/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] |
Former [2009/05] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabelhaspel mit einer oder mehreren elektrischen Vorrichtungen | [2008/21] | English: | Cord reel including one or more electrical devices | [2008/21] | French: | Bobine de corde dotée d'un ou plusieurs dispositifs électriques | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1360829 (PACAUD) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5629826 (ROCA ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4023690 (VOELKL FRANZ SKI [DE]) [Y] 1,3-6 * column 2, line 30 - column 2, line 61; figure 1 *; | [X]FR2831341 (MAZOYER JEAN MARC [FR]) [X] 8 * the whole document *; | [X]NL7312452 (BRENNENSTUHL KG HUGO [DE]) [X] 9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4405391 (BRENNENSTUHL KG HUGO [DE]) [X] 10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3916400 (SCHERER NORBERT [DE]) [X] 10 * the whole document * |