Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7943540 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2011 | B2 | US2008096753 | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006287874 | 23.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4411424B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2010 | B2 | JP2008105864 | 08.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006287874 | 23.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1918260 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2012 | B1 | EP1918260 | 07.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006287874 | 23.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101172773B | 29.06.2011 | B | CN101172773 | 07.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006287874 | 23.10.2006 |