EP1918260 - Optical glass for precision molding having high refractive index [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITA OPTICAL GLASS, INC. 4-7-25, Harigaya, Urawa-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 338-8565 / JP | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yoshinori, c/o Sumita Optical Glass, Inc. 4-7-25 Harigaya Urawa-ku Saitama City Saitama 330-8565 / JP | [2012/38] |
Former [2008/19] | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yoshinori, c/o Sumita Optical Glass, Inc. 4-7-25 Harigaya Urawa-ku Saitama City Saitama 330-8565 / JP | Representative(s) | Brown, Fraser Gregory James Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/19] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/04] | Rees, Kerry FJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/19] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254174.1 | 22.10.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | JP20060287874 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006287874 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918260 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918260 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/155, C03C3/253 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
C03C3/253 (EP,US);
C03C3/155 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/03] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Glas mit hoher Brechzahl zum Präzisionsformen | [2008/19] | English: | Optical glass for precision molding having high refractive index | [2008/19] | French: | Verre optique pour un moulage de précision ayant un indice de réfraction élevé | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 20.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1760048 (OHARA KK [JP]) [PX] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003191006 (NATSUGARI NORIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * examples 7,9,10 *; | [PA]JP2006327926 (OHARA KK) [PA] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]JP2006327925 (OHARA KK) [PA] 1 * abstract * * examples 23,39 * | by applicant | JP2005179142 | JP2002201039 | JP2005502576 | JP2006518325 | JP2005503008 |