EP1936120 - A transition duct for a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [2015/31] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, Matthew James 4 Fulmar Close Mickleover Derby, DE3 9XH / GB | 02 /
Harvey, Neil William 104 Bridge Street Derby, DE1 3LF / GB | 03 /
Naylor, Edward Michael John 102 Godsey Lane Market Depping Lincolnshire, PE6 8HZ / GB | 04 /
Ortiz-Duenas, Cecilia 1046 12th Avenue SE Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | 05 /
Hodson, Howard Peter 28 London Road Godmanchester, PE29 2JA / GB | 06 /
Miller, Robert John Gonville and Caius Trinity Street Cambridge, CB2 1TA / GB | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Barcock, Ruth Anita, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254511.4 | 20.11.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | GB20060024294 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: GB 0624294 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1936120 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1936120 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/02, F01D5/14 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
F01D5/145 (EP,US);
F01D5/143 (EP,US);
F01D9/023 (EP,US);
F05D2240/126 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/13] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Überleitkanal für eine Gasturbine | [2008/26] | English: | A transition duct for a gas turbine engine | [2008/26] | French: | Conduit de transition pour une turbine à gaz | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 20.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1632648 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0012] - [0018]; figures 1-3 *; | [XP]EP1762700 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [XP] 1,2,5,7-11,13-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0012] , [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0019] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024] , [0031] - [0037] *; | [X]US6283713 (HARVEY NEIL W [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,18 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 6; figures 6-8,11-13 * * column 3, lines 52-64 *; | [A]EP1621733 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0014] , [0015]; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US4677828 (MATTHEWS JOHN A [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 2,3a-3c *; | [A]WO2006038879 (VOLVO AERO CORP [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 2, paragraph 4; figures 2-4 * * page 15, paragraph 2 *; | [A]JPH06257597 (JISEDAI KOUKUUKI KIBAN GIJUTSU) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1632648 |