EP1927328 - Arthroscopic unicompartmental knee implantation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/23] | Arthroscopic unicompartmental knee implantation system and related method | ||
[2010/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomet Manufacturing Corp. 56 East Bell Drive Warsaw, IN 46581-0587 / US | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blackwell, Timothy J. 3091 Palm Trace Landing Drive Apt. 1416 Davie, Florida 33314 / US | 02 /
Hoeppner, Jacy C. 1827 Hobart Court Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US | 03 /
Repicci, John A. 4510 Main Street Buffalo, New York 14226 / US | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254638.5 | 29.11.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | US20060607109 | 30.11.2006 Original published format: US 607109 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927328 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1927328 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927328 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30, A61F2/38 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
A61F2/30721 (EP,US);
A61F2/30749 (EP,US);
A61F2/38 (EP,US);
A61B17/8047 (EP,US);
A61B17/809 (EP,US);
A61B17/8605 (EP,US);
A61B17/864 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/30771 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30133 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30136 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30494 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30904 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3895 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Title | German: | Arthroskopisches unikondyläres Knieimplantationssystem | [2010/29] | English: | Arthroscopic unicompartmental knee implantation system | [2010/29] | French: | Système arthroscopique d'implantation de genou monocompartiment | [2010/29] |
Former [2008/23] | Arthroskopisches unikondyläres Knieimplantationssystem und entsprechendes Verfahren | ||
Former [2008/23] | Arthroscopic unicompartmental knee implantation system and related method | ||
Former [2008/23] | Système arthroscopique d'implantation de genou monocompartiment et procédé correspondant | Examination procedure | 22.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2011 | BE | 12.01.2011 | CY | 12.01.2011 | CZ | 12.01.2011 | DK | 12.01.2011 | EE | 12.01.2011 | FI | 12.01.2011 | HU | 12.01.2011 | IT | 12.01.2011 | LT | 12.01.2011 | LV | 12.01.2011 | MT | 12.01.2011 | NL | 12.01.2011 | PL | 12.01.2011 | RO | 12.01.2011 | SE | 12.01.2011 | SI | 12.01.2011 | SK | 12.01.2011 | TR | 12.01.2011 | BG | 12.04.2011 | GR | 13.04.2011 | ES | 23.04.2011 | IS | 12.05.2011 | PT | 12.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
TR | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
IT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
RO | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
DK | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 12.01.2011 | |
BE | 12.01.2011 | ||
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
NL | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 12.01.2011 | |
CY | 12.01.2011 | ||
FI | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 12.01.2011 | |
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
PL | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | LT | 12.01.2011 | |
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
SE | 12.01.2011 | ||
GR | 13.04.2011 | ||
ES | 23.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3136636 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,9 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 19 * * figure - *; | [X]FR2575920 (MATCO [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,9 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 36 * * figure - *; | [Y]EP0809986 (HOWMEDICA [IE]) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 14 ** figures 5-10 *; | [X]FR2836821 (BIOMET MERCK FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1,7,9 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 9 * * figures 1,5-7 *; | [XY]US2005143831 (JUSTIN DANIEL F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0120] * * figures 12A-12C,13,17-22,24,25 * [Y] 3 | by applicant | EP0809986 |