10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
22.03.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
13.04.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
09.04.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
27.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
27.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
27.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
19.02.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.01.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.02.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.07.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.03.2010 |
First examination report |
|
02.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.02.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
24.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
20.08.2008 |
Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
18.07.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
18.07.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
03.06.2008 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.04.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
26.04.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|