EP2019399 - Trigger mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Defond Components Limited 5th Floor Chaiwan Industrial Centre 20 Lee Chung Street Chaiwan Hong Kong Sar / CN | [2011/31] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Defond Components Limited 5th Floor, Chaiwan Industrial Centre 20 Lee Chung Street Chaiwan Hong Kong SAR / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knuppel, Stefan 23rd Floor Chaiwan Industrial Centre 20 Lee Chung Street Chaiwan Hong Kong / CN | [2011/31] |
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
Knuppel, Stefan 23rd Floor Chaiwan Industrial Center 20 Lee Chung Street Chaiwan Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Hall, Graeme Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [2012/24] |
Former [2011/38] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2009/05] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk 43 Park Place Leeds LS1 2RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07254941.3 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | US20070782358 | 24.07.2007 Original published format: US 782358 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019399 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2019399 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2019399 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/20, H01H13/08 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
H01H13/08 (EP,US);
H01H3/20 (EP,US);
H01H9/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | Auslösemechanismus | [2009/05] | English: | Trigger mechanism | [2009/05] | French: | Mécanisme de déclenchement | [2009/05] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 28.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2011 | BE | 03.08.2011 | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | LT | 03.08.2011 | LV | 03.08.2011 | MT | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | TR | 03.08.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | ES | 14.11.2011 | IS | 03.12.2011 | PT | 05.12.2011 | IE | 19.12.2011 | LU | 19.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
ES | 14.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
MT | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
IE | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
BE | 03.08.2011 | ||
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
CY | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LV | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
LT | 03.08.2011 | ||
IS | 03.12.2011 | ||
PT | 05.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 03.08.2011 | |
IS | 03.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4572997 (YAMANOBE KEN [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0777244 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6104105 (SCHAEFFELER ALOIS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE10028916 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042]; figures 4-11 *; | [E]WO2007147665 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [E] 1-19 * the whole document *; | EP2036103 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |