EP1964601 - Thermally linked molecular sieve beds for CO2 removal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nalette, Timothy A. 77 Gilbert Road West Stafford, CT 06076 / US | 02 /
Rector, Tony 6 Elizabeth Court Broad Brook, CT 06016 / US | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2014/04] |
Former [2008/36] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07255088.2 | 31.12.2007 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | US20070710730 | 26.02.2007 Original published format: US 710730 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1964601 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1964601 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964601 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01D53/0454 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D2259/41 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/48] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Thermisch verbundene Molekularsiebbetten zur CO2-Entfernung | [2008/36] | English: | Thermally linked molecular sieve beds for CO2 removal | [2008/36] | French: | Lits de tamis moléculaire avec liaison thermique pour l'élimination du CO2 | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.06.2013 | 07.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4444727 (YANAGIHARA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 8 - line 56 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 3 *; | [X]EP0343799 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1-19 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 1 - line 25 * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 19 * * column 6, line 3 - line 10 * * column 7, line 25 - column 8, line 27 *; | [A]EP0438282 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 3,5,14* page 4, line 23 - line 58; figure 1 *; | [X]WO0213948 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [X] 1,12 * figure 1 * * page 1, column 10 - page 2, column 9 * * page 3, line 21 * * page 5, line 13 - line 26 *; | [X]US2003015093 (WEGENG ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0019] , [0038] , [0070] - [0077] - [0083] , [0134]; figure 3 * | Examination | US2002110503 | - YANG R T ET AL, "Improved Pressure Swing Adsorption Processes for Gas Separation: By Heat Exchange between Adsorbers and by High-Heat-Capacity Inert Additives", INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY PROCESS DESIGN AND DEVELOPMENT,, (19860101), vol. 25, XP002567657 | by applicant | US6364938 |