EP1955722 - Method for providing a composite film onto a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ball, Vincent 11 Rue du prieur Hoffer 67500 Marienthal / FR | 02 /
Voegel, Jean-Claude 10 Rue des Flaques 67210 Valff / FR | 03 /
Schaaf, Pierre 5 Rue Poudrière 67120 Molsheim / FR | 04 /
Ladhari, Nadia 7 Rue de la Ziegelau 67100 Strasbourg / FR | 05 /
Hemmerle, Joseph 44 Rue Baldung-Grien 67720 Weyersheim / FR | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290160.6 | 08.02.2007 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955722 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/30, A61L27/34, A61L27/42, A61L27/44, B05D1/06 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
A61L27/306 (EP);
A61L27/34 (EP);
A61L27/427 (EP);
A61L27/446 (EP);
C23C26/00 (EP);
C23C30/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/17] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anbringung einer Verbundfolie auf einem Substrat | [2008/33] | English: | Method for providing a composite film onto a substrate | [2008/33] | French: | Procédé pour la fourniture d'un film composite sur un substrat | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006216494 (FUREDI-MILHOFER HELGA [IL] ET AL) [X] 1-4,12-14,20,21 * page 2, paragraph 11 * * page 4, paragraph 44; examples 1-4 *; | [X]US2003211129 (SPILLMAN WILLIAM B [US] ET AL) [X] 13,14,18-21 * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraph 58 * * page 4, paragraphs 65,68,71 * * page 5, paragraphs 75,76,82 *; | [A]WO2004056404 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]; NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH [AT]; QIU YONGXING [US]; WINTER) [A] 1-21 * page 28; claim - *; | [DA]WO2004047880 (YISSUM RES AND DEV OF THE HEBR [IL]; UNIV PASTEUR [FR]; MILHOFER-FURED) [DA] 1-21 * claim - * | [X] - ROSIDIAN A ET AL, "IONIC SELF-ASSEMBLY OF ULTRAHARD ZRO2/POLYMER NANOCOMPOSITE THIN FILMS", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (19981001), vol. 10, no. 14, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 1087 - 1091, XP000781868 [X] 13-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4095(199810)10:14<1087::AID-ADMA1087>3.3.CO;2-F | [X] - HAN J.T. ET AL., "STABLE SUPERHYDROPHOBIC ORGANIC-INORGANIC HYBRID FILMS BY ELECTROSTATIC SELF-ASSEMBLY", J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (200511), vol. 109, no. 44, pages 20773 - 20778, XP002442530 [X] 13-17,21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp052691x | [T] - LAUGEL N. ET AL., "NANOCOMPOSITE SILICA/POLYAMINE FILMS PREPARED BY A REACTIVE LAYER-BY-LAYER DEPOSITION.", LANGMUIR, (200703), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 3706 - 3711, XP002442531 [T] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la063052w |