EP1826283 - Hydridable alloy for alkaline storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saft Groupe S.A. 12, rue Sadi Carnot 93170 Bagnolet / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Saft Groupe S.A. 12 Rue Sadi Carnot 93170 Bagnolet / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states SAFT 12 Rue Sadi Carnot 93178 Bagnolet / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernard, Patrick 28 rue d'Audenge 33000 Bordeaux / FR | 02 /
Knosp, Bernard 88 rue Pierre Brossolette 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | 03 /
Latroche, Michel 33 rue Gabriel Peri 78210 Saint-Cyr-L'Ecole / FR | 04 /
Ferey, Amélie 1, avenue Charles Comar 91440 Bures-sur-Yvette / FR | [2007/41] |
Former [2007/35] | 01 /
Bernard, Patrick 62 rue des Remparts 33000 Bordeaux / FR | ||
02 /
Knosp, Bernard 88 rue Pierre Brossolette 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | |||
03 /
Latroche, Michel 33 rue Gabriel Peri 78210 Saint-Cyr-L'Ecole / FR | |||
04 /
Ferey, Amélie 1, avenue Charles Comar 91440 Bures-sur-Yvette / FR | Representative(s) | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude Cabinet Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude Cabinet Hirsch 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290197.8 | 16.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | FR20060001751 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: FR 0601751 | [2007/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826283 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1826283 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/03, C01B6/24, H01M4/24, H01M4/38 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
H01M4/242 (EP,US);
C01B3/0057 (EP,US);
C22C19/03 (EP,US);
C22C19/07 (EP,US);
H01M4/26 (EP,US);
H01M4/383 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/19] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wasserstoffaufnehmende Legierung für alkalischen Akkumulator | [2007/35] | English: | Hydridable alloy for alkaline storage battery | [2007/35] | French: | Alliage hydrurable pour accumulateur alcalin | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 01.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11100601 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] *; | [AD]US2004146782 (YASUOKA SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2005100789 (MURATA TETSUYUKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2004115870 (SANTOKU CORP) [AD] 1-23 * abstract *; | [AD]US2005164083 (YASUOKA SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2005175896 (ISHIDA JUN [JP], et al) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6214492 (KONO TATSUOKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1026764 (TOSHIBA BATTERY [JP]) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2004134569 (YASUOKA SHIGEKAZU [JP], et al) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document * |