EP1837238 - Structural trim component of an automobile comprising a peripheral joint formed by impregnation of foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE D'ETUDE ET DE RECHERCHE POUR L'AUTOMOBILE (CERA) 2, rue Emile Arques 51100 Reims / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states CENTRE D'ETUDE ET RECHERCHE POUR L'AUTOMOBILE ( CERA) 2, rue Emile Arques 51100 Reims / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brillon, Eric 1, Chemin de la Vieille Voie 51140 Chalons sur Vesle / FR | 02 /
Moncuy, Franck 7, rue des Charmilles 51500 Nogent-Sermiers / FR | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Sayettat, Julien Christian STRATO-IP 18, rue Soleillet 75020 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP 18, rue Soleillet 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/39] | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP BL 57 - 14, rue Solleillet 75020 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290350.3 | 22.03.2007 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | FR20060002535 | 23.03.2006 Original published format: FR 0602535 | [2007/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1837238 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837238 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R5/04, B29C44/14 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
B60R5/044 (EP);
B29C44/1209 (EP);
B29C44/1266 (EP);
B29C44/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | Strukturelles Innenausstattungsbauteil für Kraftfahrzeug, das eine umlaufende Dichtungsfuge umfasst, die mittels Schaumimprägnierung gebildet ist | [2007/39] | English: | Structural trim component of an automobile comprising a peripheral joint formed by impregnation of foam | [2007/39] | French: | Composant structurel de garnissage de véhicule automobile comprenant un joint périphérique formé par imprégnation de mousse | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 04.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.2010 | CY | 17.02.2010 | CZ | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IE | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | LV | 17.02.2010 | MT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | PL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | LU | 22.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
LU | 22.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
MT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
CY | 17.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 17.02.2010 | |
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4555141 (NEMOTO AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract ** figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4878827 (MULLER JOHN [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19814956 (HEIDEL GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2864922 (CERA [FR]) [DA] 1,11 * the whole document * |