EP1975486 - Dispensing valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fillon Technologies (SAS Société par Actions Simplifiée) 2 Route de Houdan BP 21078 28210 Faverolles / FR | [2014/49] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Fillon Technologies (SAS Société par Actions Simplifiée) 2 Route de Houdan BP 21078 28210 Faverolles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chassaing, Antoine 1, rue du Marché 28300 Clévilliers / FR | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Godineau, Valérie, et al Ipsilon 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Godineau, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Brema-Loyer 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | ||
Former [2008/40] | Lang, Johannes, et al SEP Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 14 boulevard Malesherbes 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290369.3 | 28.03.2007 | [2008/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975486 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1975486 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, B67D3/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B67D3/0041 (EP,US);
B44D3/127 (EP,US);
B67D3/0003 (EP,US);
F16K31/0658 (EP,US);
G01F11/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, PL [2009/24] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dosierventil | [2008/40] | English: | Dispensing valve | [2008/40] | French: | Valve de dosage | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14189617.5 / EP2916054 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3409142 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-15 * page 12, line 10 - page 13, line 16; figure - *; | [A]EP0236693 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 2 * column 4, lines 9-50; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0252421 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,12,13,15 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 53; figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0283137 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,9,10,12,13,15 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 16; figures 3.,4 *; | [A]US2005092386 (KAUFHOLD KENNETH R [US], et al) [A] 1,2* paragraphs [0017] - [0025]; figure 10 * | by applicant | GB207392 | DE3409142 | EP0252421 | EP0283137 | WO2006027450 |