EP1843078 - Gas bottle with alarm device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie des Gaz de Pétrole Primagaz 4, Rue Hérault de Séchelles 75017 Paris / FR | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouvier, Daniel 8, rue du Chemin Vert 75011 Paris / FR | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Victor Albert Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Eidelsberg, Victor Albert Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290380.0 | 30.03.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | FR20060003087 | 07.04.2006 Original published format: FR 0603087 | [2007/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843078 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/02, G01F23/62 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G01F23/60 (EP);
F17C13/021 (EP);
G01F23/62 (EP);
F17C2221/035 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2250/036 (EP);
F17C2250/0408 (EP);
F17C2250/0413 (EP);
F17C2250/0486 (EP);
F17C2250/0491 (EP);
F17C2250/077 (EP);
F17C2270/0745 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | HR | 10.04.2008 | Title | German: | Gasflasche mit Warnvorrichtung | [2007/41] | English: | Gas bottle with alarm device | [2007/41] | French: | Bouteille à gaz à dispositif d'alerte | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] | Divisional application(s) | EP09001288.1 / EP2051000 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4736077 (VALENTE GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DX]US5831536 (ZAGER RAYMOND [US]) [DX] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0228823 (BALLOON WORKS INC [US]) [DX] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002038676 (SIEGELE STEPHEN H [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * figures 4,5,8 *; | [X]NL7807169 (K J F M MERTENS) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003056827 (KATO NOBUHIDE [JP] ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4924703 (WHITE JOHN J [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5090212 (KELTNER ROBERT L [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS62282226 (YAZAKI CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document * |