EP1986281 - Method for manufacturing a conducting electrical connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nachbauer, Otto Kolpingstrasse 10 92685 Floss / DE | 02 /
Riedel, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Hardt 4 92685 Floss / DE | 03 /
Eiletz, Christian Goethestrasse 10 92637 Weiden / DE | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07290530.0 | 26.04.2007 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1986281 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1986281 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52, H01R13/74 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
H01R13/5202 (EP,US);
H01R13/745 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer elektrisch leitenden Verbindung | [2008/44] | English: | Method for manufacturing a conducting electrical connection | [2008/44] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une liaison électrique conductrice | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 10.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.04.2009 | DK | 22.04.2009 | EE | 22.04.2009 | FI | 22.04.2009 | IE | 22.04.2009 | LT | 22.04.2009 | LV | 22.04.2009 | MT | 22.04.2009 | NL | 22.04.2009 | RO | 22.04.2009 | SI | 22.04.2009 | SK | 22.04.2009 | TR | 22.04.2009 | LU | 26.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | BG | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.07.2009 | ES | 02.08.2009 | IS | 22.08.2009 | PT | 22.08.2009 | HU | 23.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | DK | 22.04.2009 | |
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
MT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
LU | 26.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | DK | 22.04.2009 | |
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
MT | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
LU | 26.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/20] | DK | 22.04.2009 | |
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | DK | 22.04.2009 | |
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | DK | 22.04.2009 | |
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2009 | ||
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | FI | 22.04.2009 | |
LT | 22.04.2009 | ||
LV | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
IS | 22.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19752921 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-4* column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE10003924 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 3 - line 26 * * column 4, line 9 - line 43; figures 4,7 * |