EP1858147 - Current conversion circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Converteam SAS 1 Square John H. Patterson 91300 Massy / FR | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gollentz Bernard 8, rue de l'Avenir 68360 Soultz / FR | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290615.9 | 15.05.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | FR20060004471 | 18.05.2006 Original published format: FR 0604471 | [2007/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1858147 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1858147 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/06, H02H9/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
H02H9/002 (EP);
H02M7/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2013/47] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stromumwandlungskreis | [2007/47] | English: | Current conversion circuit | [2007/47] | French: | Circuit de conversion de courant | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2012 | 31.05.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19735867 (SIEMENS AG OESTERREICH [AT]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8; | [Y]DE4309484 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 3-8 * column 11, line 55 - column 12, line 15; figure 8 *; | [X]DE3507318 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 34 * |