EP1878621 - Bumper of an automobile vehicle, in particular for a station-wagon type vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faurecia Bloc Avant 2, rue Hennape 92000 Nanterre / FR | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duquesnoy, David 26 rue de Courcelles 25400 Arbouans / FR | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290789.2 | 26.06.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | FR20060006361 | 12.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0606361 | [2008/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878621 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878621 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/18 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B60R19/18 (EP);
B60R2019/1806 (EP);
B60R2019/186 (EP);
B60R2019/1886 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugstoßstange insbesondere für Kombiwagen | [2008/03] | English: | Bumper of an automobile vehicle, in particular for a station-wagon type vehicle | [2008/03] | French: | Pare-chocs de vehicule automobile, notamment pour vehicule de type break | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2007 | AT | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | IE | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | MT | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | LU | 26.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
LU | 26.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 22.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6364384 (KEMP RONALD S [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * * figure 5 * [A] 2; | [X]FR2833910 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 6, lines 10-13 * * page 7, lines 4-27 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2005280269 (EVANS DARIN [US]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017]; figures 1,4 *; | [PA]FR2883238 (PEGUFORM FRANCE SA [FR]) [PA] 1-5* the whole document * |