EP2009127 - Process for manufacturing a galvanized or a galvannealed steel sheet by DFF regulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal France 1à 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertrand, Florence 82, voie de la Liberté 54000 Scy-Chazelles / FR | 02 /
Huin, Didier 73 rue du Maréchal Oudinot 54000 Nancy / FR | 03 /
Saint-Raymond, Hubert 6 rue Wilson 57000 Metz / FR | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290813.0 | 29.06.2007 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2009127 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/02, C23C2/06, C23C2/28 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
C23C2/40 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/0222 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/561 (EP,KR,US);
C22C1/11 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/0038 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/0224 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/06 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/261 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | 30.06.2009 | BA | 30.06.2009 | HR | 30.06.2009 | MK | 30.06.2009 | RS | 30.06.2009 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines galvanisierten oder Galvanneal-Stahlblechs durch DFF-Regulierung | [2009/01] | English: | Process for manufacturing a galvanized or a galvannealed steel sheet by DFF regulation | [2009/01] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'une feuille d'acier galvanisé ou recuit après galvanisation par régulation DFF | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1170057 (ASS ELECT IND [GB]) [Y] 1-17 * page 1 - page 2; claims 1,4-6 *; | [Y]US4437905 (NITTO HAJIME [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-8 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 27; claim 1 *; | [A]US2003047255 (DELAUNAY DIDIER [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0020] *; | [Y]BE1014997 (CT RECH METALLURGIQUES ASBL [BE]) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1-6 * * page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 15 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 11 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 33 * * page 6, lines 22-32 * * page 9, lines 23-27 * * page 10, lines 15-29 *; | [A]EP1612288 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 8-17 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0046]; claims 1,4 *; | [A]WO2006061151 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7,13,17 * figure 1; claims 1-3,6,7,9 * * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 12 * * page 6, lines 10-14 ** page 7, lines 25-28 *; | [A]WO2007064172 (POSCO [KR], et al) [A] 16,17 * paragraphs [0087] - [0089]; claims 1,6,7 * |