EP1890080 - Method of preparing a load containing biomass with a view to subsequent gasification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states IFP 1 et 4 Avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemaire, Eric 16 Lotissement des Pépinières 69480 Anse / FR | 02 /
Boudet, Nicolas 125 route des Collonges 69360 Chaponost / FR | [2008/08] | Application number, filing date | 07290855.1 | 06.07.2007 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | FR20060007049 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0607049 | [2008/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1890080 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1890080 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890080 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/02, F23G5/027, F23G5/04, F23G5/20, F23G5/30, F23G7/02, F23G7/10 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
F23G5/02 (EP,US);
C10J3/50 (EP,US);
C10L5/44 (EP,US);
C10L9/083 (EP,US);
F23G5/027 (EP,US);
F23G5/04 (EP,US);
F23G5/20 (EP,US);
F23G5/30 (EP,US);
F23G7/02 (EP,US);
F23G7/105 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0903 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0923 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0983 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0989 (EP,US);
F23G2201/702 (EP,US);
F23G2201/80 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02E50/30 (EP,US);
Y02P20/145 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Eintrags, der die Biomasse enthält, im Hinblick auf eine spätere Gaserzeugung | [2008/08] | English: | Method of preparing a load containing biomass with a view to subsequent gasification | [2008/08] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une charge contenant de la biomasse en vue d'une gazeification ultèrieure | [2010/19] |
Former [2008/08] | Procédé de préparation d'une charge contenant de la biomasse en vue d'une gazeification ulterieure | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 16.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | HU | 29.09.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | MT | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH228877 (SENEZE MARCEL [FR]) [A] 1,11 * page 2, line 18 - line 77 *; | [A]GB944282 (JOSEF RIEPEL, et al) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [DA]WO8606930 (CLERC DE BUSSY LE) [DA] 1,11 * page 2, line 15 - line 33 * * page 7, line 1 - line 10 *; | [A]US2003221363 (REED THOMAS B [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1; claims 1,2 * |