EP1882551 - Physical method of delustring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/05] | Physical method of delustring and installation | ||
[2010/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifco Industrie Parc d'Activités du Moulin d'Ecalles 76750 Buchy / FR | [2008/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iacob, Constantin 7 rue du bout d'aval 76690 St. Georges sur Fontaine / FR | 02 /
Bucher, Sébastien 5 rue de l'Eglise 76660 Clais / FR | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Pichat, Thierry, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | Pichat, Thierry, et al Novagraaf Technologies, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07290946.8 | 26.07.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | FR20060006903 | 27.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0606903 | [2008/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1882551 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1882551 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1882551 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B24C3/18, B24C7/00, B24C9/00, B24C11/00 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
B24C3/18 (EP);
B24C11/00 (EP);
B24C7/0084 (EP);
B24C9/006 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Title | German: | Physikalisches Mattierungsverfahren | [2010/32] | English: | Physical method of delustring | [2010/32] | French: | Procédé physique de dépolissage | [2010/32] |
Former [2008/05] | Physikalisches Mattierungsverfahren und Anlage | ||
Former [2008/05] | Physical method of delustring and installation | ||
Former [2008/05] | Procédé physique de dépolissage et installation | Examination procedure | 24.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 26.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.01.2011 | CZ | 12.01.2011 | EE | 12.01.2011 | LT | 12.01.2011 | LV | 12.01.2011 | MT | 12.01.2011 | SI | 12.01.2011 | SK | 12.01.2011 | BG | 12.04.2011 | IS | 12.05.2011 | PL | 26.07.2011 | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/49] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
PL | 26.07.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
FR | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
MT | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
CZ | 12.01.2011 | ||
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
SK | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
EE | 12.01.2011 | ||
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 12.01.2011 | |
LT | 12.01.2011 | ||
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
SI | 12.01.2011 | ||
BG | 12.04.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 12.01.2011 | |
LV | 12.01.2011 | ||
IS | 12.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3093418 (DOBLE ALLAN M) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, lines 9-45 * * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 45 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 21 * * figure 3 *; | [A]DE1508988 (TILGHMAN WHEELABRATOR LTD [GB]) [A] 5* the whole document *; | [Y]US5201150 (KUBOYAMA MATAO [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 29 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 44 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5239788 (WOODSON JERRY P [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, lines 12-15 * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 40 * * column 5, lines 1-42 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US6074135 (TAPPHORN RALPH M [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 14, lines 23-46 * * column 15, lines 29-46 * * column 18, line 22 - column 20, line 6 * * figures 7,9 *; | [Y]US2001007808 (MISHIMA AKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0036] , [0040] , [0042] , [0056] , [0060] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1304189 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0016] , [0019] , [0020] , [0024] , [0025] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032] , [0033] , [0035] , [0042] * |