EP2028848 - Method of providing an information guide containing service information for a communication device, communication device and communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Technology Holdings LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2016/14] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Motorola, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garrec, David Rue Du Trosy 92140 Clamart / FR | 02 /
Ambrosinsi, Francois 33 Bis Rue Du Chateaur Landon 7510 Paris / FR | 03 /
Freitag, Cecile 5 Allee Jacques Henri Lartigue 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Conroy, John, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Schley, Jan Malte, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07291038.3 | 23.08.2007 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028848 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
H04N7/163 (EP);
H04N21/4622 (EP);
H04N21/478 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bereitstellung eines Informationsführers mit Dienstinformationen für eine Kommunikationsvorrichtung, Kommunikationsvorrichtung und Kommunikationssystem | [2009/09] | English: | Method of providing an information guide containing service information for a communication device, communication device and communication system | [2009/09] | French: | Procédé pour la fourniture d'une guide d'informations contenant des informations de service pour un dispositif de communication, dispositif de communication et système de communication | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY] - CHRIS STECK, "Delivering Total Mobile TV", (200604), URL: http://docs.real.com/docs/industries/DeliveringTotalMobileTV.pdf, (20080520), XP002482031 [DY] 1-12 * PDF file can be found directly at the given URL.; page 8 - page 9 * | [Y] - PHILIP LEROUX ET AL, "Synchronized Interactive Services for Mobile Devices over IPDC/DVB-H and UMTS", BROADBAND CONVERGENCE NETWORKS, 2007. BCN '07. 2ND IEEE/IFIP INTE RNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20070501), ISBN 978-1-4244-1297-6, pages 1 - 12, XP031178259 [Y] 1-12 * page 5 - page 8 * | [A] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); IP Datacast over DVB-H: Electronic Service Guide (ESG) European B roadcasting U nion U nion E uropéenne de R adio-Télévision EB UÜER; ETSI TS 102 471", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, (20061101), vol. BC, no. V1.2.1, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014039808 [A] 1-12 * page 6 * * page 11 - page 12 * * page 41 * | Examination | US2006225093 | WO2007052111 | WO2009015190 |