EP1903647 - Distribution assembly comprising electrical appliances in modular format [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Legrand France 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre-de-Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | [2017/29] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Legrand France 128 avenue du Maréchal de Lattre-de-Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | |||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states LEGRAND FRANCE 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaymard, Gilles 10 Avenue Henri Matisse 06200 Nice / FR | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/46] | Lepelletier-Beaufond, François Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/13] | Lepelletier-Beaufond, François Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07291067.2 | 05.09.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | FR20060053877 | 21.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0653877 | [2008/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903647 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903647 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1903647 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/20 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
H02B1/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verteilereinheit, die elektrische Geräte im Modulformat umfasst | [2008/13] | English: | Distribution assembly comprising electrical appliances in modular format | [2008/13] | French: | Ensemble de distribution comportant des appareils électriques au format modulaire | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
18.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
18.08.2014
ADMISSIBLE Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE Opponent's representative Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2014/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.2014
Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE Opponent's representative Schröder, Christoph Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 150920 10671 Berlin / DE | 19.09.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.01.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.10.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.06.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2007 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | MT | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | GB | 05.09.2014 | IE | 05.09.2014 | LU | 05.09.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 05.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 05.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 05.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
GB | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0729167 (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 31-49 * * column 5, lines 12-18 * * column 6, lines 3-23 * * column 8, lines 3-23; figures 1,2 * | Opposition | DE69602218T | DE19547557 | DE29719177U | DE4322535 | DE69002662T | DE19626390 | DE69008139T | - "Clipline 2005" Extrait du cataloque de la societé Phoenix Contact GmbH |