EP1921362 - Double clamp collar and assembly method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hellermanntyton 12 Rue des Hetres, B.P. 130 78190 Trappes / FR | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodriguez, Manuel 186, Boulevard de Créteil 94100 Saint-Maur-des-Fosses / FR | 02 /
Cherdo, Pascal 19, Avenue de Crespieres 78650 Beynes / FR | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Roger, Walter, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Roger, Walter, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07291240.5 | 11.10.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | FR20060009743 | 08.11.2006 Original published format: FR 0609743 | [2008/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1921362 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1921362 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/08, F16L3/237, F16L3/137 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
F16L3/085 (EP);
B65D63/1063 (EP);
F16L3/137 (EP);
F16L3/237 (EP);
H02G3/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Doppelspannschelle und Montageverfahren | [2008/20] | English: | Double clamp collar and assembly method | [2008/20] | French: | Collier double de serrage et procédé de montage | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 15.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | IE | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | MT | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | HU | 29.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
MT | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19820651 (KABELSCHLEPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12* figures 4-8 *; | [A]US2002071715 (GEIGER GERARD G [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] - [0009] - [0053] - [0056] * * figure - * |