EP1920697 - Roll of paper towels for sanitary or household use with a lateral groove [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA TISSUE FRANCE 151-161, boulevard Victor Hugo 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [2016/01] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states SCA TISSUE FRANCE 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific France 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific France 11, route Industrielle 68320 Kunheim / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruppel, Rémy 6, rue des Vosges 68320 Durrenentzen / FR | 02 /
Cattacin, Gilles 30, rue de Thann 68000 Colmar / FR | 03 /
Jaegler, Arnaud 14, rue Weiss 67860 Boofzheim / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
Ruppel, Rémy 6, rue des Vosges 68320 Durrenentzen / FR | ||
02 /
Cattacin, Gilles 15A, boulevard du Champs de Mars 68000 Colmar / FR | |||
03 /
Jaegler, Arnaud 14, rue Weiss 67860 Boofzheim / FR | Representative(s) | Cortier, Sophie, et al SCA TISSUE FRANCE 151-161, boulevard Victor Hugo 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [2017/14] |
Former [2010/36] | Cortier, Sophie, et al Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2008/20] | Thomas, Nadine Georgia-Pacific France 23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau 92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07291247.0 | 12.10.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | FR20060009510 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0609510 | [2008/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1920697 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1920697 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/16 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
A47K10/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2008/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 14.11.2008 | BA | 14.11.2008 | HR | 14.11.2008 | MK | 14.11.2008 | RS | 14.11.2008 | Title | German: | Absorbierende Papierrolle für den Sanitär- oder Haushaltseinsatz mit einer seitlichen Hohlkehle | [2008/20] | English: | Roll of paper towels for sanitary or household use with a lateral groove | [2008/20] | French: | Rouleau de papier absorbant à usage sanitaire ou domestique avec une gorge latérale | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2007 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MT | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | IE | 12.10.2017 | LU | 12.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 12.10.2007 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.10.2007 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.10.2007 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 12.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 12.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3029035 (LAYTON J C) [A] 1-4,6,7 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 10; figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]US5205455 (MOODY JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-4,6 * column 3, lines 16-48; figure 1 *; | [A]US3282525 (REHR HENRY W) [A] 1,3,4,6,7 * column 3, lines 14-29 * * column 4, lines 8-31; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0096984 (CROWN ZELLERBACH CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7 * abstract * |