EP2065329 - Device for protecting a raised object and method of manufacturing the device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vidal Diffusion Marine 1523 Avenue de Dragiugnan Zi Toulon Est 83130 La Garde / FR | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meranger, Aimé Villa 41 Rue des Orchidées 83140 Six Fours les Plages / FR | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07291415.3 | 28.11.2007 | [2009/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065329 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/18, B63C3/06, B63B59/00 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
B66C1/18 (EP);
B63B59/02 (EP);
B63C3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/06] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schutz eines angehobenen Objekts und Verfahren zur Umsetzung der Vorrichtung | [2009/23] | English: | Device for protecting a raised object and method of manufacturing the device | [2009/23] | French: | Dispositif pour protéger un objet soulevé at procédé de réalisation du dispositif | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2891524 (MERANGER AIME [FR]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3622025 (PETERSEN ARNOLD C) [A] 1,6 * figure - *; | [A]US5238279 (ANTEAU PAUL D [US]) [A] 1,6 * figure - *; | [A]US4350380 (WILLIAMS WILLIAM C) [A] 1,6 * figure - * | by applicant | FR2452459 | FR2891524 |