EP2065355 - Process for cooling the stream leaving an ethylbenzene dehydrogenation reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Total Petrochemicals France 4-8, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dernoncourt, Renaud Papenkasteel 103 1180 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
Thoret Bauchet, Jean-Pierre Rue de Calevoet, 110 H 1180 Bruxelles / BE | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Roufosse, Micheline C. Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Roufosse, Micheline C. Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 07291441.9 | 29.11.2007 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065355 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C5/333 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
C07C5/333 (EP,US);
C07C7/09 (US);
C07C2523/745 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/333, C07C15/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/06] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kühlung des aus einem Reaktor zur Dehydrierung von Ethylbenzol austretenden Stroms | [2009/23] | English: | Process for cooling the stream leaving an ethylbenzene dehydrogenation reactor | [2009/23] | French: | Processus de refroidissement de flux dans un réacteur de déshydrogénation d'éthybenzène | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3515764 (HALLMAN NEWT M, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, lines 21-66; figure 1 *; | [X]US3515766 (ROOT WAYNE N, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 18; figure 1 *; | [X]US3515765 (BERGER CHARLES V) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 49; figure 1 *; | [X]US3515767 (CARSON DON B, et al) [X] 1-6* column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 3; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2092018 (COSDEN TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-6 * Page 2, lines 32-43; page 2, line 108 - page 3, line 8;; figure 1 * | by applicant | US3256355 | US4288234 | US4628136 | US6388155 |