EP1975831 - Device and method for digital processing management of content so as to enable an imposed work flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing, Inc. 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onno, Stephane 6 allee Claude Debussy 35760, SAINT GREGOIRE / FR | 02 /
Heen, Olivier 20 rue des Tournesols 35410, Domloup / FR | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07300899.7 | 27.03.2007 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975831 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
G06F21/1063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/24] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur digitalen Verarbeitung der Inhaltsverwaltung zum Ermöglichen eines auferlegten Arbeitsflusses | [2008/40] | English: | Device and method for digital processing management of content so as to enable an imposed work flow | [2008/40] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la gestion d'un traitement numérique d'un contenu afin d'activer un flux de travail imposé | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0669741 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,8,9 * page 2, line 44 - line 48 *; | [X]US5982891 (GINTER KARL L [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 37, line 50 - line 54 * * column 162, line 4 - line 22 * * column 163, line 13 - line 15 * * column 214, line 8 - line 24 *; | [X]US2003115450 (SMITH JEFFREY C [US]) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0046] *; | [X]US2003217264 (MARTIN ANDREW K [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0018] , [0020] *; | [X]US6834110 (MARCONCINI FRANCO [IT], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 18, line 15 - column 20, line 41 * * column 21, line 55 - line 60 * * column 25, line 31 - column 30, line 11 *; | [A] - MARSHAK R T, "IBM'S FLOWMARK OBJECT-ORIENTED WORKFLOW FOR MISSION-CRITICAL APPLICATIONS", WORKGROUP COMPUTING REPORT, (19940501), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 1057-8889, pages 3 - 13, XP000568699 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - FRIDRICH J, "HYBRID WATERMARK FOR TAMPER DETECTION IN DIGITAL IMAGES", INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SIGNAL PROCESSING AND ITS APPLICATIONS. PROCEEDINGS, (19990822), vol. 1, pages 301 - 304, XP000937952 [A] 7,13 * the whole document * | [A] - DEGUILLAUME F ET AL, "Secure hybrid robust watermarking resistant against tampering and copy attack", SIGNAL PROCESSING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200310), vol. 83, no. 10, ISSN 0165-1684, pages 2133 - 2170, XP004452923 [A] 7,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-1684(03)00172-5 |