EP2006687 - Method of testing a subject thought to have or be predisposed to having asthma, allergie, atopic disease or atopic sensitization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble Le Ponant D 75015 Paris / FR | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07301135.5 | 20.06.2007 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2006687 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, // A61P11/06, A61P37/08 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
G01N2500/10 (EP,US);
G01N2800/122 (EP,US);
G01N2800/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Testen einer Person auf Leiden an oder auf Prädisposition für das Leiden an Asthma, Allergien, atopischen Erkrankungen oder atopischen Sensibilisierungen | [2008/52] | English: | Method of testing a subject thought to have or be predisposed to having asthma, allergie, atopic disease or atopic sensitization | [2008/52] | French: | Procédé de test d'un sujet dont on pense qu'il a ou qu'il est prédisposé à de l'asthme, des allergies, une maladie atopique ou une sensibilisation atopique | [2009/16] |
Former [2008/52] | Procédé de test dýun sujet dont on pense quýil a ou quýil est prédisposé à de lýasthme, des allergies, une maladie atopique ou une sensibilisation atopique | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9833817 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14-16 * claim 1; figures 1A/B; lines 29-30 on page 9; from line 29 on page 20 to line 8 on page 21; the first full paragraph on page 30 *; | [X]WO0070047 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 49, line 14 - page 50, line 13; claim 1; sequence 22 *; | [X]WO02059260 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [X] 14-16 * page 51, line 15 - line 22; claims 1,20,27,28; sequence 353 *; | [XY]WO03073990 (CHILDRENS HOSP MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12,14,15 * claims 6,10,22,27,32,36,38 * [Y] 4,16; | [Y] - FAN CHAOHONG, "Orosomucoid types in allergic contact dermatitis", HUMAN HEREDITY, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (1995), vol. 45, no. 2, ISSN 0001-5652, pages 117 - 120, XP009092704 [Y] 4,16 * abstract * |