Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.09.2010 | Change - German title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
17.09.2010 | Change - English title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
17.09.2010 | Change - French title | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
14.08.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.08.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
29.07.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.12.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |