EP1902899 - Device for attaching securing means to a wall comprising an opening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault SAS 13-15, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michelin, Didier 5, rue de la Mare 78950 Gambais / FR | [2008/13] | Application number, filing date | 07301195.9 | 02.07.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | FR20060008273 | 21.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0608273 | [2008/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902899 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902899 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/08, B60P7/15 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B60P7/0807 (EP);
B60P7/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Koppelungsmittels an einer Wand, die eine Öffnung aufweist | [2008/13] | English: | Device for attaching securing means to a wall comprising an opening | [2008/13] | French: | Dispositif pour fixer un moyen d'arrimage sur une paroi comportant une ouverture | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 17.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | LT | 25.02.2009 | LV | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | PL | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | IS | 25.06.2009 | LU | 02.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
LU | 02.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
LU | 02.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3300171 (WELTON WATTS MAX); | [A]FR2411328 (BAZIN ROBERT [FR]); | [A]US5273382 (YEARICK TIMOTHY A [US]); | [A]EP1162112 (SORTIMO SPEEDWAVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10134887 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) | by applicant | EP1038726 |