EP2065978 - A mechanical connector with incorporated cable centring means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ridelin, S.L. Sallent, s/n-Pol. Ind. "Els Dolors" 08240 Manresa (Barcelona) / ES | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capelles de la Fuente, Rosa c/o Ridelin, S.L. Sallent, s/n Pol. Ind. Els Dolors 08240 Manresa (Barcelona) / ES | [2015/34] |
Former [2009/23] | 01 /
Capelles de la Fuente, Rosa c/o Ridelin, S.L. Sallent, s/n Pol. Ind. Els Dolors 08240 Manresa (Barcelona) / ES | Representative(s) | Morgades y Manonelles, Juan Antonio, et al Morgades, del Rio, Renter S.L. C/ Rector Ubach, 37-39 bj 2.o 08021 Barcelona / ES | [2012/18] |
Former [2009/23] | Aragones Forner, Rafael Angel, et al Morgades, Del Rio, Renter, S.L. Rector Ubach, 37-39, bjs. 2ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 07380335.5 | 30.11.2007 | [2009/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065978 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2065978 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/36, H01R11/11, H02G15/007, H02G15/192 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
H01R4/36 (EP);
H01R11/11 (EP);
H02G15/007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | H01R4/36, H01R11/11, H02G15/192 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mechanische Verbinder mit darin enthaltenen Kabelzentrierungsmitteln | [2009/23] | English: | A mechanical connector with incorporated cable centring means | [2009/23] | French: | Connecteur mécanique avec supports de centrage de câble incorporés | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2007 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | GB | 30.11.2015 | IE | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | LU | 30.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
IE | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE19960198 (PFISTERER KONTAKTSYST GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [A] 4 [Y] 6; | [YDA]EP1788684 (RIDELIN SL [ES]) [YD] 6 * the whole document * [A] 1-5; | [A]DE202006000833U (CALIEBE REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [AD]ES2281291 (RIDELIN SL [ES]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2299640 (B & H LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19960198 | EP1788684 | ES2281291 | DE202006000833U | GB2299640 |