EP1939129 - Pallet assembly for a transport system for the movement of passengers/goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Norte, S.A. Poligono Industrial La Pereda, s/n 33682 Mieres-Asturias / ES | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Elevator (ES/PBB) Ltd. Burgan House Reception C, First Floor The Causeway Staines London TW18 3PA / GB | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzalez Alemany, Miguel Angel C/ Suarez de la Riva, 2-2 Izq. 33007 Oviedo (Asturias) / ES | 02 /
Gonzalez Pantiga, Juan Domingo Urbanización Playa del Arbeyal, 6-3 A 33212 Gijon (Asturias) / ES | 03 /
Alonso Cuello, Manuel Camino del Lucero, 7,3 H 33212 Gijon (Asturias) / ES | 04 /
Muñiz Camblor, Abdón Fernando Vela, no. 18 33011 Oviedo (Asturias) / ES | [2010/39] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
Gonzalez Alemany, Miguel Angel C/ Suarez de la Riva, 2-2 Izq. 33007 Oviedo (Asturias) / ES | ||
02 /
Gonzalez Pantiga, Juan Domingo Urbanizacion Playa del Arbeyal, 6-3 A 33212 Gijon (Asturias) / ES | |||
03 /
Alonso Cuello, Manuel Camino del Lucero, 7,3 H 33212 Gijon (Asturias) / ES | |||
04 /
Muniz Camblor, Abdon Fernando Vela, no. 18 33011 Oviedo (Asturias) / ES | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co., C/ Goya No. 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07380370.2 | 20.12.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | ES20060003322 | 29.12.2006 Original published format: ES 200603322 | [2008/27] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1939129 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1939129 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1939129 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B66B23/02 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B66B23/02 (EP,US);
B66B21/12 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | Palettenanordnung für ein Fördersystem zum Transport von Passagieren oder Waren | [2008/27] | English: | Pallet assembly for a transport system for the movement of passengers/goods | [2008/27] | French: | Ensemble palette pour système de transport pour le déplacement de passagers/marchandises | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | LT | 29.09.2010 | LV | 29.09.2010 | MT | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | PL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | IE | 20.12.2010 | LU | 20.12.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/14] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
IT | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
IT | 20.12.2010 | ||
LU | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
IT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
IT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
IT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
IT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
IT | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 20.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | BE | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/22] | FI | 29.09.2010 | |
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1383785 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS); | [A]US3811385 (JOHNSON E, et al); | [A]US3908811 (CORTESE CESARE, et al); | [Y]DE4101111 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [Y]JP2000247564 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US6138816 (SATO TOMOAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1253101 (THYSSEN NORTE S A [ES]) | by applicant | DE4101111 | ES2179720 |