Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
24.11.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.08.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
26.02.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.11.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.08.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
20.05.2009 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.04.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
23.01.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
23.01.2009 | First examination report | |
05.12.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
01.08.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
30.05.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |