Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7997400 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2011 | B2 | US2010181163 | 22.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES200603324 | 29.12.2006 | US58067509 | 16.10.2009 | US96530807 | 27.12.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008164119 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES200603324 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008201584 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | ES200603324 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1939128 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2008 | A3 | EP1939128 | 02.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ES200603324 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101234726B | 02.01.2013 | B | CN101234726 | 06.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | ES200603324 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2289955 | 05.05.2009 | B1 | ES2289955 | 01.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES200603324 | 29.12.2006 |