EP2027878 - Injection device filled with local anaesthetic for on-the-spot therapy for insect bites for anyone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wührer, Klaus Waldhauser Feld 10 84359 Simbach/Inn / DE | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Sporer, Christian SIWE Rechtsanwälte Sinzger & Partner Innstrasse 71 94036 Passau / DE | [2009/16] |
Former [2009/09] | Sporer, Christian Sonnenstrasse 4 D-94072 Bad Füssing / DE | Application number, filing date | 07400020.9 | 18.08.2007 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027878 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/28, A61F17/00, A61K31/167, A61K31/245 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A61M5/28 (EP);
A61K31/167 (EP);
A61K31/245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/44] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Injektionsvorrichtung gefüllt mit Lokalanästhetikum zur Sofort-therapie von Insektenstichen für jedermann | [2009/09] | English: | Injection device filled with local anaesthetic for on-the-spot therapy for insect bites for anyone | [2009/09] | French: | Dispositif d'injection rempli d'anesthésiant local destiné au traitement direct de piqûres d'insecte pour tout le monde | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 29.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.02.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 29.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.02.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE202006016229U (WUEHRER KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * |