EP1981245 - Method and product for controlling laboratory equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LICONIC AG Industriestrasse 8 9493 Mauren / LI | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALIN Cosmas, C. Bachtalwingert 10 FL-9493 Mauren / LI | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Sutter, Kurt, et al E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Sutter, Kurt, et al E. Blum & CO. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07405120.2 | 13.04.2007 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1981245 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
H04L67/025 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00881 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/26] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Produkt zur Steuerung von Laborgeräten | [2008/42] | English: | Method and product for controlling laboratory equipment | [2008/42] | French: | Procédé et produit pour contrôler un équipement de laboratoire | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1391861 (O2 GERMANY GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0039] , [0040] * * paragraphs [0053] , [0058] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0079] , [0080] * * paragraphs [0097] - [0099] * * paragraphs [0103] , [0104] *; | [A]EP0825506 (FOXBORO CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 32 - column 6, line 5 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 18 *; | [A]EP0937283 (SCHNEIDER AUTOMATION [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]US2004158812 (DYE ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0060] * | [X] - JOE DESBONNET ET AL, "SYSTEM ARCHITECTURE AND IMPLEMENTATION OF A CEBus/INTERNET GATEWAY", IEEE, (199711), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 1057 - 1062, XP011008490 [X] 1,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [02.1] , [02.2] , [02.4] * * paragraph [03.1]; figure 2 * | [A] - SHAHEEN M ET AL, "Remote laboratory experimentation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE. 1998 ACC. PHILADELPHIA, PA, JUNE 24 - 26, 1998, AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19980624), VOL. 2 CONF. 16, ISBN 0-7803-4531-2, pages 1326 - 1329, XP002964099 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * |