EP1998297 - Improved automatic vending machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.A.S. International S.p.A. Via Lago di Vico, 60 36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cattaneo, Pietro Via Manfron 3 36015 Schio (VI) / IT | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [2012/19] |
Former [2009/48] | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2008/49] | Simino, Massimo, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza S. Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425356.8 | 07.06.2007 | [2008/49] | Priority number, date | IT2007MI01130 | 01.06.2007 Original published format: IT MI20071130 | [2008/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1998297 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1998297 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1998297 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07F13/10 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
G07F13/065 (EP);
G07F13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Title | German: | Verbesserter Verkaufsautomat | [2008/49] | English: | Improved automatic vending machine | [2008/49] | French: | Distributeur automatique amélioré | [2008/49] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Observations by third parties | 22.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08171998.1 / EP2061012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2009
07.01.2010
ADMISSIBLE Saeco Vending S.p.A. Località Casona 1066 40041 Gaggio Montano (BO) / IT Opponent's representative Mannucci, Michele Via della Scala, 4 50123 Firence / IT | [2010/06] | 22.01.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.07.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.06.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.03.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.03.2009 | BE | 18.03.2009 | CY | 18.03.2009 | CZ | 18.03.2009 | DK | 18.03.2009 | EE | 18.03.2009 | FI | 18.03.2009 | LT | 18.03.2009 | LV | 18.03.2009 | MT | 18.03.2009 | NL | 18.03.2009 | PL | 18.03.2009 | RO | 18.03.2009 | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | TR | 18.03.2009 | IE | 07.06.2009 | LU | 07.06.2009 | BG | 18.06.2009 | SE | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | IS | 18.07.2009 | PT | 27.08.2009 | HU | 19.09.2009 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | [2015/29] |
Former [2012/50] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CY | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
MT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
TR | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 07.06.2009 | ||
LU | 07.06.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CY | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
MT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
TR | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 07.06.2009 | ||
LU | 07.06.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CY | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
MT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
TR | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 07.06.2009 | ||
LU | 07.06.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
MT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 07.06.2009 | ||
LU | 07.06.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
IT | 07.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
MT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 07.06.2009 | ||
LU | 07.06.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
IT | 07.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 07.06.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2155907 (SANKEY VENDING LTD) [X] 1,2,4,11-13* the whole document *; | [XA]US2004069795 (SAMS GARY L [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9-13 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045]; figures 7-10,15,16 * [A] 5-8; | [X]EP1526485 (KRAFT FOODS UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,10-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0065] *; | [X]FR2883089 (DALLIANCE SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMP [FR]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 20 * * page 6, line 4 - page 6, line 6 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 12 * |