EP2014551 - Device and method for protecting an aircraft component from collision with flying objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agusta S.p.A. Via G. Agusta, 520 Frazione Cascina Costa 21017 Samarate / IT | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anghileri, Marco Via F. Landonio 10 20154 Milano / IT | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425425.1 | 09.07.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014551 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014551 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64D33/02, F02C7/05 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B64D33/02 (EP,US);
F02C7/055 (EP,US);
B64D2033/022 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Schutz eines Flugzeugbauteils vor Kollisionen mit fliegenden Objekten | [2009/03] | English: | Device and method for protecting an aircraft component from collision with flying objects | [2009/03] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour protéger un composant d'avion contre la collision avec des objets volants | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 05.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.2009 | BE | 23.12.2009 | CY | 23.12.2009 | CZ | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | LT | 23.12.2009 | LV | 23.12.2009 | MT | 23.12.2009 | NL | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | SI | 23.12.2009 | SK | 23.12.2009 | BG | 23.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | ES | 03.04.2010 | IS | 23.04.2010 | HU | 24.06.2010 | IE | 09.07.2010 | LU | 09.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
IE | 09.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 09.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 09.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 09.07.2010 | ||
IT | 09.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4261168 (GRIGORIAN KAREN K, et al) [X] 1,3-9 * column 1, lines 7-45 * * column 5, line 23 - column 7, line 22 ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6089824 (SOARES EDUARDO ALVES TINOCO [BR]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9 * column 1, lines 12-18 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 12 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE102004018585 (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,3,8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] * * figures 1-5 * |