EP2022715 - Submarine countermeasure launching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whitehead Alenia Sistemi Subacquei S.p.A. Via di Levante, 48 57124 Livorno / IT | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benvenuti, Massimo Via Derna, 26 57124 Livorno / IT | 02 /
Calvo, Giovanni Via Campigliese, 1 57020 Bibbona / IT | 03 /
Lazzerini, Maurizio Via Coen, 3 57124 Livorno / IT | 04 /
Campoccio, Vincenzo Via San Giovanni, 18 57123 Livorno / IT | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425452.5 | 24.07.2007 | [2009/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022715 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2022715 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B63G9/02, B63G8/32 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
B63G8/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | Submarine Gegenmassnahmenabwurfvorrichtung | [2009/07] | English: | Submarine countermeasure launching device | [2009/07] | French: | Dispositif de lancement de contre-mesure sous-marine | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 25.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | BE | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | LT | 09.12.2009 | LV | 09.12.2009 | MT | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | PL | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | IS | 09.04.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | IE | 24.07.2010 | LU | 24.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
MT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
LU | 24.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
MT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
MT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
IE | 24.07.2010 | ||
IT | 24.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
LV | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5117731 (MENDENHALL MARK A [US]) [A] 1 * figures 3,5,7 *; | [A]US6386133 (RYERSON MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10324180 (NORDSEEWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US6854409 (GALLIANO CARLOS E [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1580117 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |