EP2072019 - Dental abutment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baldi, Paolo Giuseppe Corso Magenta, 27 20123 Milano / IT | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Arena, Giovanni Viale Certosa 135 20151 Milano / IT | [2009/26] | Application number, filing date | 07425813.8 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072019 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
A61C8/005 (EP);
A61C8/0087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/09] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dentaler Aufbaupfosten | [2009/26] | English: | Dental abutment | [2009/26] | French: | Pilier dentaire | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006105296 (LINDER ANDREAS [CH] ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]EP0727193 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]WO2005115267 (CIPPICIANI GIANLUCA [IT]; CASINI VINCENZO MARIA [IT]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]US5782918 (KLARDIE MICHAEL ROBERT [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US3797113 (BRAININ H) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5348154 (JACOBS DWIGHT W [US] ET AL) [Y] 3 * the whole document * |