EP1936318 - Method for producing additional armour [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steyr-Daimler-Puch Spezialfahrzeug GmbH 2 Haidequerstrasse 3 1111 Wien / AT | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Christoph Jägerstrasse 89-95/17/24 1200 Wien / AT | 02 /
Skrivanek, Karl Beckmanngasse 4-13 1140 Wien / AT | 03 /
Lausch, Johannes Hubertusgasse 12 2440 Gramatneusiedl / AT | 04 /
Pawlick, Thomas Rathstrasse 6 1190 Wien / AT | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Andreas, et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Rippel, Andreas, et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing., Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07450218.8 | 29.11.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | AT20060002105 | 21.12.2006 Original published format: AT 21052006 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1936318 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F41H5/04 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
F41H5/0492 (EP,US);
F41H5/0421 (EP,US);
F41H5/0428 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FI, IT, LI [2009/10] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zusatzpanzerung | [2008/26] | English: | Method for producing additional armour | [2008/26] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un blindage supplémentaire | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 30.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 17.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4307140 (DAVIS THOMAS E) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, line 47 - column 11, line 29 * * figure - *; | [A]US5361678 (ROOPCHAND BRIJMOHAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 24 * * figure - *; | [DY]DE4417172 (WORWAG LACK FARBENFABRIK GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1522817 (COHEN MICHAEL [IL]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0048] *; | [A]EP1734332 (PLASAN SASA LTD [IL]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0042] ** figure - *; | [PA]DE102005050981 (KRAUSS MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & C [DE]) [PA] * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0047] * * figure - * | Examination | DE69203475T | by applicant | DE1952759 | DE3716055 | DE4417172 | EP0963795 |