EP1936035 - Panels with antinoise and antifragmentation properties on the basis of acrylic glass, process for their preparation and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akripol proizvodnja in predelava polimerov, d.d. Prijateljeva 11 8210 Trebnje / SI | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Japelj, Bostjan Seidlova cesta 34 8000 Novo mesto / SI | 02 /
Krvavica, Robert Ulica Danila Bucarja 6 8000 Novo mesto / SI | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Redensek, Vladimira Patentna pisarna d.o.o. Copova 14 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Redensek, Vladimira Patentna Pisarna d.o.o. Copova 14 P.O. Box 1725 1001 Ljubljana / SI | Application number, filing date | 07468012.5 | 07.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | SI20060000290 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: SI 200600290 | [2008/26] | Filing language | SL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1936035 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1936035 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
E01F8/0017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | 05.12.2008 | BA | 05.12.2008 | HR | 05.12.2008 | MK | 05.12.2008 | RS | 05.12.2008 | Title | German: | Tafel mit Lärm- und Splitterschutzeigenschaften auf der Basis von Kunstglas, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Verwendung dafür | [2008/26] | English: | Panels with antinoise and antifragmentation properties on the basis of acrylic glass, process for their preparation and use thereof | [2008/26] | French: | Panneaux avec propriétés anti-bruit et anti-fragmentation sur la base de verre acrylique, leur processus de préparation et utilisation correspondante | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 15.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | BE | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | IT | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | LV | 18.11.2009 | MT | 18.11.2009 | NL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | IE | 07.12.2009 | LU | 07.12.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | ES | 28.02.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | MC | 01.07.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/28] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 07.12.2009 | ||
LU | 07.12.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 07.12.2009 | ||
LU | 07.12.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
NL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3824077 (DEGUSSA AG, 6000 FRANKFURT, DE) [A] 1,11* the whole document *; | [DA]WO0020690 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1008692 (POLARTHERM FLACHGLAS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0407852 | EP0826832 | WO0020690 | EP1119662 |