EP2102763 - PROVISION OF SERVICES THROUGH COMMUNICATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mavenir Systems Oy Lars Sonckin Kaari 16 02600 Espoo / FI | [2016/21] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Airwide Solutions OY Pihatörmä 1 B 02240 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHOMÄKI, Timo Kielotie 8 AD FI-02260 Espoo / FI | 02 /
IKONEN, Teemu Alamäki 2 B 8 FI-02760 Espoo / FI | 03 /
KOPONEN, Juha Poutamäentie 13 A 21 FI-00360 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
VUORJOKI, Risto Otsonkallio 3 F 33 FI-02110 Espoo / FI | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2016/36] |
Former [2013/40] | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/39] | Kalliola, Sanna Marketta Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07700280.6 | 12.01.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007FI50015 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008084133 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102763 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102763 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04L12/24, H04L29/08, H04W4/18, G06Q10/10, G06Q30/04 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06F16/958 (US);
H04L41/5054 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | G06F17/30, H04L12/24, H04Q7/22, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG VON DIENSTEN DURCH KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZE | [2009/39] | English: | PROVISION OF SERVICES THROUGH COMMUNICATION NETWORKS | [2009/39] | French: | FOURNITURE DE SERVICES PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE DE RÉSEAUX DE COMMUNICATION | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 08.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 04.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2007 | AT | 07.09.2016 | BE | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | IE | 12.01.2017 | LU | 12.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.01.2007 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.01.2007 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
IE | 12.01.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
LU | 12.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PFEIFER T ET AL, "m-Mag: The Mobile Magazine Services Platform", MOBILE COMMERCE AND SERVICES, 2005. WMCS '05. THE SECOND IEEE INTERNAT IONAL WORKSHOP ON MUNICH, GERMANY 19-19 JULY 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050719), ISBN 978-0-7695-2391-0, pages 122 - 129, XP010883190 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.1] , [ 2.2.1] * * figure 2 * | [X] - PFEIFER ET AL, "UGetMobile End-user Mobile Publishing Platform", E-COMMERCE TECHNOLOGY, 2006. THE 8TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AND ENTERPRISE COMPUTING, E-COMMERCE, AND E-SERVICES, THE 3RD IEEE INT ERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 26-29 JUNE 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060710), ISBN 978-0-7695-2511-2, pages 78 - 78, XP031001327 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [01.2] , [ 3.2.3] * | International search | [A]US2004117199 (FREMANTLE PAUL ZACHARY [GB], et al); | [X] - PFEIFER T. ET AL., "m-Mag: The Mobile Magazine Services Platform", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 SECOND IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MOBILE COMMERCE AND SERVICES (WMCS#05). MUNICH, GERMANY, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, IEEE, (20050719), XP031001327 | [Y] - PFEIFER T. ET AL., "UGetMobile End-user Mobile Publishing Platform", PROCEEDINGS OF JOINT CONFERENCE 8TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON E-COMMERCE AND TECHNOLOGY/3RD IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ENTERPRISE COMPUTING, E-COMMERCE AND E-SERVICES/3RD IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MOBILE COMMERCE AND WIRELESS...., (20060626), XP010883190 | [A] - CRKVENAC B., "Mobile operator's IT middleware infrastructure", INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY INTERFACES, 2003. ITI 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 25TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, IEEE, (20030616), XP010654777 | [A] - CHANIOTAKIS E. ET AL., "External service provision in telecommunications networks using open interfaces", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (20040101), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 1 - 12, XP004481135 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-3664(03)00178-6 |