EP1973758 - WHEEL DRIVE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURATA, Satoshi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07700477.8 | 09.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007IB00081 | Priority number, date | JP20060010487 | 18.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006010487 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007083209 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1973758 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60K7/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
B60K17/046 (EP,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0038 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/07] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RANDANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/40] | English: | WHEEL DRIVE APPARATUS | [2008/40] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENTRAINEMENT DE ROUE | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 19.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0401511 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 5, line 9 - line 50; figure . * [I] 8; | [XI]WO0170534 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 30 - line 33; figure 1 * [I] 5-8; | [XI]SU1710366 ; | [XI]DE3924817 (STEHLE JOSEF & SOEHNE [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 3; figure 2 * [I] 5-8; | [DA]JPH05238276 (SMH MANAGEMENT SERVICES AG) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5322141 (BRUNNER RAPHAEL [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 51, Database accession no. 1992-423051, XP002432628 & SU1710366 A1 19920207 (VORON FORGE PRESS PRODN ASSOC) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [I] 5-8 |