EP1976813 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PROPYLENE, RESTORATION METHOD FOR CATALYST, AND SOLID ACID CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states Toyota Tsusho Corporation 9-8, Meieki 4-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-8575 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toyota Tsusho Corporation 9-8, Meieki 4-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-8575 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABA, Toshihide c/o Tokyo Institute of Technology 4257, Nagatsuta Midori-ku Yokohama Kanagawa 226-8503 / JP | 02 /
ONO, Reiko c/o Toyota Tsusho Corporation 9-8, Meieki 4-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya 450-8575 / JP | 03 /
HOMMA, Nobutaka Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07700524.7 | 18.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007IB00191 | Priority number, date | JP20060012634 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006012634 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007083241 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1976813 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/20 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
C07C1/20 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US);
Y02P30/40 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/20, C07C11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | IT [2009/16] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROPYLEN, VERFAHREN ZUR KATALYSATORREGENERATION UND FESTER SÄUREKATALYSATOR | [2008/41] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PROPYLENE, RESTORATION METHOD FOR CATALYST, AND SOLID ACID CATALYST | [2008/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PROPYLENE, PROCEDE DE REGENERATION DE CATALYSEUR ET CATALYSEUR ACIDE SOLIDE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 04.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005051872 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * examples II,III *; | [X]US2005197412 (VAN EGMOND COR F [US], et al) [X] 1-14,16,17 * example 2 *; | [PX]WO2006033759 (UOP LLC [US], et al) [PX] 1-17 * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] - [0043]; claims 1-4 *; | [X] - JÜRGEN SCHULZ AND FRIEDHELM BANDERMANN, "Conversion of Ethanol over Metal-exchanged Zeolites", CHEM. ENG. TECHNOL., (1993), vol. 16, pages 332 - 337, XP002438322 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - ANA G. GAYUBO ET AL, "Kinetic Modelling of the Transformation of Aqueous Ethanol into Hydrocarbons on a HZSM-5 Zeolite", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (20010707), vol. 40, pages 3467 - 3474, XP002438323 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie001115e | [X] - R. LE VAN MAO ET AL, "ETHYLENE FROM ETHANOL OVER ZEOLITE CATALYSTS", APPLIED CATALYSIS, (1987), vol. 34, pages 163 - 179, XP002438324 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - MACHADO N R C F ET AL, "Obtaining hydrocarbons from ethanol over iron-modified ZSM-5 zeolites", FUEL, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS, GUILDFORD, GB, (200511), vol. 84, no. 16, ISSN 0016-2361, pages 2064 - 2070, XP004988350 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2005.05.001 | [X] - R. LE VAN MAO ET AL, "Conversion of Ethanol in Aqueous Solution over ZSM-5 Zeolites Influence of Reaction Parameters and Catalyst Acidic Properties as Studied by Ammonia TPD Technique", APPLIED CATALYSIS, (1990), vol. 61, pages 161 - 173, XP002438325 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - AGUAYO ET AL, "Regeneration of a HZSM-5 zeolite catalyst deactivated in the transformation of aqueous ethanol into hydrocarbons", CATALYSIS TODAY, ELSEVIER, (20051030), vol. 107-108, ISSN 0920-5861, pages 410 - 416, XP005122516 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cattod.2005.07.043 | [X] - ANDRES T AGUAYO ET AL, "Study of operating variables in the transformation of aqueous ethanol into hydrocarbons on an HZSM-5 zeolite", J. CHEM. TECHNOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 77, pages 211 - 216, XP002438326 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | [X] - KITAYAMA YOSKIE ET AL, "CATALYTIC ACTIVITY OF FIBROUS CLAY MINERAL SEPIOLITE FOR BUTADIENE FORMATION FROM ETHANOL", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (1981), vol. 9, ISSN 0022-4936, pages 401 - 402, XP009085246 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39810000401 | [X] - CRESSELY J, "EVOLUTION SUR NICKEL NON SUPPORTE DE PRODUITS OXYGENES FORMES DANS LA REACTION DE FISCHER-TROPSCH", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, MASSON, PARIS, FR, (1982), vol. 2, ISSN 0037-8968, pages 171 - 175, XP009085248 [X] 1 * table 1 * | [X] - BOS U ET AL, "DIE REAKTIONEN VON ACETALDEHYD, ETHANOL UND ESSIGSAEURE AN EINEM RHODIUM/KIESELSAEURE-KATALYSATOR", BERICHTE DER BUNSEN-GESELLSCHAFT FUR PHYSIKALISCHE CHEMIE, VERLAG CHEMIE. WEINHEIM, DE, (1982), vol. 84, ISSN 0005-9021, pages 182 - 186, XP009085244 [X] 1 * Section 3.2 * | [X] - JORDI LLORCA ET AL, "Direct production of hydrogen from ethanolic aqueous solutions over oxide catalysts", CHEM. COMMUN., (2001), pages 641 - 642, XP002438327 [X] 1 * table 1 * |